U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00074
  • Case Name: Short et al v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Appeal Transcript Request]
  • April 06, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 06, 2020: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • April 03, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Costs Taxed]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Bill of Costs]
  • February 12, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion in Limine]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order]
  • January 24, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 17, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 16, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 16, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 15, 2020: [Exclude]
  • January 15, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 14, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 10, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • January 09, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 08, 2020: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • January 08, 2020: [Declaration]
  • January 08, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • January 07, 2020: [File Excess Pages]
  • January 07, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Declaration]
  • December 30, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 27, 2019: [In Limine]
  • December 27, 2019: [Declaration]
  • December 27, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • December 27, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • December 27, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 27, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 26, 2019: [Declaration]
  • December 26, 2019: [In Limine]
  • December 24, 2019: [Declaration]
  • December 24, 2019: [In Limine]
  • December 20, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • December 20, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 20, 2019: [Declaration]
  • December 20, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 19, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • December 18, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 11, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • December 10, 2019: [Declaration]
  • December 10, 2019: [In Limine]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 15, 2019: [~Util - Set Trial Management Order Deadlines]
  • November 14, 2019: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Quash]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Order]
  • September 16, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 12, 2019: [Stipulation]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 09, 2019: [Quash]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order]
  • August 05, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 01, 2019: [Stipulation]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • April 16, 2019: [Corrective Entry]
  • April 03, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 18, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 18, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: [Response to Motion]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 29, 2019: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 28, 2019: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order Staying Case]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • December 21, 2018: [Declaration]
  • December 21, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 22, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • August 22, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 20, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 13, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Litigation Order]
May, 2018
  • May 08, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 08, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • May 08, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 08, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • February 14, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.