U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00078
  • Case Name: Dalton v. Cincinnati Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Judgment]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 22, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 18, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • September 14, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 14, 2018: [Statement]
  • September 14, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 14, 2018: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • September 14, 2018: [Expert Witness Disclosure]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Stipulation]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Supplement]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Order]
  • May 14, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • May 04, 2018: [Expert Witness Disclosure]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • April 12, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order]
  • April 04, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • March 28, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • March 07, 2018: [Status Report]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • February 21, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • February 21, 2018: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • February 21, 2018: [Docket Annotation - Division Change]
  • February 16, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 16, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
  • February 15, 2018: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.