U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00073
  • Case Name: Rush v. Wienstein et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Clarify]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [New Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [In Limine]
  • March 08, 2022: [In Limine]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Sanctions]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Exclude]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Quash]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Supplement]
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Strike]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • January 22, 2021: [Seal]
  • January 22, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Seal Document]
  • October 09, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [Stipulation]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • April 24, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • April 08, 2020: [Notice of Substitution]
  • April 08, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Notice of Substitution]
  • March 03, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Status Report]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice of Substitution]
  • December 19, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Expert]
  • October 07, 2019: [Status Report]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • September 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 01, 2019: [Appoint Expert]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: [Order]
  • March 14, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 14, 2019: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 14, 2019: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Declaration]
  • December 18, 2018: [Order]
  • December 18, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order]
  • December 06, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • November 20, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • November 01, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 25, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • September 24, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 24, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 21, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 27, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 23, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 09, 2018: [Request]
  • August 02, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • July 23, 2018: [Order]
  • July 05, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • June 19, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • June 19, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order]
  • June 19, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 02, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 02, 2018: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • March 22, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 22, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • February 15, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • February 15, 2018: [Complaint]
  • February 15, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • February 15, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.