U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00075
  • Case Name: Sullender v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 17, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
October, 2018
  • October 04, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
  • September 06, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 24, 2018: [Declaration]
  • August 24, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 06, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Administrative Record]
  • July 26, 2018: [Answer to Petition for Review]
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • June 12, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • June 07, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
April, 2018
  • April 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • February 20, 2018: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • February 15, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 15, 2018: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • February 15, 2018: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.