U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00077
  • Case Name: Mejia v. Canyon County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Letter]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order]
  • November 20, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 25, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 25, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 25, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 15, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 15, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 15, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: [Order]
  • July 13, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
  • April 10, 2018: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • April 10, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • February 15, 2018: [Complaint]
  • February 15, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 15, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.