U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00076
  • Case Name: Crawford v. Christensen
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [USCA Order]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 29, 2019: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 29, 2019: [Letter]
  • October 29, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 28, 2019: [Certificate of Appealability]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 26, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 26, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Response to Motion]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Affidavit in Support]
  • May 30, 2019: [File Excess Pages]
  • May 06, 2019: [Response to Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 16, 2019: [File Excess Pages]
  • April 16, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • April 16, 2019: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • April 16, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 16, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • April 16, 2019: [Leave to File Document]
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • January 10, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 04, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • January 04, 2019: [File Excess Pages]
December, 2018
  • December 05, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Request]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • February 21, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • February 16, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 16, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • February 16, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • February 16, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.