U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00519
  • Case Name: Dickinson Frozen Foods, Inc. v FPS Food Process Solutions Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Reconsideration]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Certify]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Strike]
  • November 05, 2021: [Strike]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [File Excess Pages]
  • October 01, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Entry of Default]
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [Strike]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • February 26, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Strike]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Discovery]
  • August 05, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Take Deposition]
  • June 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Reply (generic)]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 10, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • September 13, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 06, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • September 06, 2019: [Supplement]
  • September 06, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • September 05, 2019: [Notice of Substitution]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 30, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order]
  • August 21, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • August 16, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 09, 2019: [Take Deposition]
  • August 09, 2019: [Protective Order]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • July 10, 2019: [Stipulation]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Affidavit of Service]
  • May 22, 2019: [Order]
  • May 22, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 22, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 09, 2019: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 07, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 25, 2019: [Affidavit of Service]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 07, 2019: [Affidavit of Service]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory]
  • March 04, 2019: [Stipulation]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Affidavit of Service]
  • February 20, 2019: [Letters Rogatory]
  • February 12, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 28, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 18, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • January 18, 2019: [Protective Order]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Errata]
  • December 21, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • December 21, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order]
  • December 21, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 21, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 20, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 07, 2018: [Declaration]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • November 30, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 17, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • October 30, 2018: [Sanctions]
  • October 30, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • October 29, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order]
  • October 11, 2018: [Stipulation]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Affidavit of Service]
  • September 24, 2018: [Affidavit of Service]
  • September 13, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 07, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • September 05, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 05, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Order]
  • August 27, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 23, 2018: [Stipulation]
July, 2018
  • July 03, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 20, 2018: [Order]
  • June 19, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • May 04, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 16, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • April 11, 2018: [Response to Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 21, 2018: [Order]
  • March 21, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 21, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • March 19, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • March 19, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • March 05, 2018: [Consent Filed]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 28, 2018: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • February 28, 2018: [Counterclaim]
  • February 16, 2018: [Litigation Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.