U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00079
  • Case Name: McDermott v. Monday Monday LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 09, 2019: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Bond]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Bond]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order]
  • January 17, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 17, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 16, 2019: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
  • January 16, 2019: [Discovery Plan]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • November 26, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
October, 2018
  • October 02, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • September 12, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 15, 2018: [Order]
  • August 15, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 15, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: [Set Aside Default]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • May 29, 2018: [Order]
  • May 23, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • May 22, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • May 22, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • May 22, 2018: [Default Judgment]
  • May 18, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 18, 2018: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • May 08, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • May 08, 2018: [Entry of Default]
April, 2018
  • April 06, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Affidavit of Service]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • February 16, 2018: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • February 16, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • February 16, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.