U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cv-00081
  • Case Name: Kellis v. Atencio et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [USCA Memorandum]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [USCA Order]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [USCA Order]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • December 27, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 27, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • December 21, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 18, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 18, 2018: [Letter]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order]
  • December 06, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 06, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Letter]
August, 2018
  • August 02, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 02, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 02, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order]
  • July 02, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 02, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 02, 2018: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • February 16, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 16, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • February 16, 2018: [Complaint]
  • February 16, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • February 16, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.