U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00080
  • Case Name: Duvall v. Idaho Department of Corrections et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Dismiss]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • May 01, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Notice of Substitution]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order]
  • March 06, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 06, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Compel]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • December 17, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 15, 2019: [Response to Discovery Request]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 01, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 15, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 16, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 15, 2019: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • February 08, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 08, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order]
  • January 10, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • February 16, 2018: [Complaint]
  • February 16, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • February 16, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 16, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.