U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00083
  • Case Name: Hitchcock v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 25, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 25, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 18, 2019: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order]
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [Response (generic)]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 24, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 17, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Administrative Record]
  • June 27, 2018: [Answer to Petition for Review]
  • June 01, 2018: [Consent Filed]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 30, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2018
  • April 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • February 21, 2018: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • February 20, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 20, 2018: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • February 20, 2018: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.