U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00086
  • Case Name: Simplot Livestock Company et al v. Suftin et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [Judgment]
  • October 01, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 06, 2018: [Order]
  • September 06, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Status Conference]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Order]
  • April 24, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 24, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • April 17, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 17, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 13, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order]
  • April 09, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 20, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 15, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • March 15, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • March 14, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 12, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • February 21, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • February 21, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • February 21, 2018: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • February 21, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 21, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 21, 2018: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 21, 2018: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • February 20, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.