U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00448
  • Case Name: Byerly v. State of Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [USCA Order]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 12, 2018: [Strike]
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 22, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Judgment]
  • April 19, 2018: [Order]
  • April 19, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 05, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • February 22, 2018: [Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.