U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00088
  • Case Name: BAGLEY v. MODERN WOODMEN OF AMERICA et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 22, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 05, 2019: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 05, 2019: [Statement]
  • March 05, 2019: [Response to Motion]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • January 30, 2019: [Declaration]
  • January 30, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order]
  • January 07, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order]
  • December 07, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 13, 2018: [Vacate]
  • November 13, 2018: [Litigation Order]
October, 2018
  • October 10, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Order]
  • June 22, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 21, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order]
  • June 12, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2018
  • May 01, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 18, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • April 05, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 03, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order]
  • March 22, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 22, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 20, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 12, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 09, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
  • March 09, 2018: [Strike]
  • March 09, 2018: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • March 06, 2018: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • February 28, 2018: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 28, 2018: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • February 28, 2018: [Supplement]
  • February 23, 2018: [Supplement]
  • February 23, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • February 22, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.