U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00090
  • Case Name: Holt v. Ada County
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 02, 2019: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • April 02, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • February 13, 2019: [Response to Motion]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Compel]
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 15, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • October 15, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Litigation Order]
May, 2018
  • May 04, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 04, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • May 04, 2018: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
  • May 02, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 30, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 30, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 27, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 26, 2018: [Status Report]
  • April 16, 2018: [Litigation Order]
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 07, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • March 06, 2018: [Supplement]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • February 23, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.