U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00089
  • Case Name: Beck v. Jeffries et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 25, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 18, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 18, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Stipulation]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 17, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 30, 2019: [Order]
  • January 29, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Order]
  • September 04, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 01, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • July 30, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • June 05, 2018: [Consent Filed]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 30, 2018: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 29, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 28, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 25, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 22, 2018: [Summons Issued]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • February 23, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.