U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00092
  • Case Name: Gonzales et al v. Burley High School et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [Dismiss]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Response to Motion]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Supplement]
  • April 06, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 02, 2020: [File Excess Pages]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • March 23, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • March 18, 2020: [Seal]
  • March 03, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Stipulation]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Order]
  • September 12, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 07, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 07, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 05, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Order]
  • July 26, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 26, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 05, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 13, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 14, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order]
  • February 01, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • February 01, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2019
  • January 21, 2019: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • January 11, 2019: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • January 11, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • December 14, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • December 10, 2018: [Protective Order]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • October 12, 2018: [Settlement Conference]
August, 2018
  • August 01, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order]
June, 2018
  • June 07, 2018: [Order]
May, 2018
  • May 07, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 07, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • May 07, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • April 17, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order]
  • April 17, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • April 16, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 16, 2018: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 09, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • April 09, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • April 09, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Affidavit of Service]
  • March 22, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • March 12, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 05, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • March 05, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • February 26, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.