U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00091
  • Case Name: Hawkins v. Idaho Board of Correction et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 28, 2018: [Order]
  • November 28, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2018
  • October 10, 2018: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • October 10, 2018: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 10, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 27, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • September 27, 2018: [Order]
  • September 27, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • February 26, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 26, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • February 26, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.