U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00093
  • Case Name: Godsill v. Americold Realty Trust et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Bill of Costs]
  • December 04, 2019: [Attorney Fees]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 20, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 06, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 23, 2019: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • October 23, 2019: [Order]
  • October 23, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 22, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 19, 2019: [Declaration]
  • October 19, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 17, 2019: [Declaration]
  • October 17, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 17, 2019: [Notice of Substitution]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 07, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Errata]
  • July 26, 2019: [Declaration]
  • July 26, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 06, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 11, 2019: [Order]
  • April 11, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 11, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2018
  • October 02, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • October 02, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 21, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • August 21, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 14, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 02, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 02, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • July 02, 2018: [Disclosure Statement]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order]
  • June 05, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • May 29, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • May 29, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • May 07, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • April 23, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 16, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 03, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 28, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • March 28, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 15, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 05, 2018: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • February 27, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.