U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00072
  • Case Name: Zazueta v. Dale G Haile Detention Center
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 31, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Order]
  • June 12, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Request]
  • May 09, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • May 09, 2018: [Order]
  • May 09, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 02, 2018: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.