U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00094
  • Case Name: Dorfman v. Albertson's, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Notice of Substitution]
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [Memorandum Decision]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
May, 2019
  • May 06, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 17, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 16, 2019: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • April 05, 2019: [Stipulation]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 27, 2019: [Certify Class]
  • March 18, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 11, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 12, 2019: [Order]
  • February 12, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 14, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • December 03, 2018: [Response to Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 12, 2018: [Certify]
  • November 06, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2018
  • July 03, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 03, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 06, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • May 21, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 21, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 15, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • May 14, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 14, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • May 03, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • May 03, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • May 03, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 02, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 02, 2018: [Dismiss]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • February 28, 2018: [Order]
  • February 27, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.