U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00104
  • Case Name: Oak Valley Organics, LLC v. Organic West Milk, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 05, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • February 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • February 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • February 12, 2019: [Order]
  • February 12, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 11, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
  • February 04, 2019: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 30, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 23, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 16, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • January 16, 2019: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • January 16, 2019: [Strike]
  • January 16, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 10, 2019: [Strike]
November, 2018
  • November 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 17, 2018: [Expert Witness Disclosure]
  • October 17, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 17, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2018
  • August 06, 2018: [Settlement Conference]
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: [Order]
  • July 09, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 09, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 06, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: [Order]
  • June 06, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 06, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 05, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • June 05, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: [Order]
  • May 03, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 01, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • May 01, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 17, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order]
  • April 17, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • April 17, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 16, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 16, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 06, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • April 05, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • April 05, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • March 20, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • March 19, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 07, 2018: [Jury Demand]
  • March 07, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 28, 2018: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • February 28, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 28, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 28, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 28, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.