U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00102
  • Case Name: Haar et al v. Kandler Farms, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 13, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • June 13, 2018: [Judgment - Default]
  • June 12, 2018: [Clerks Entry of Default]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Entry of Default]
  • May 18, 2018: [Default Judgment]
  • May 16, 2018: [Consent Filed]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 25, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • April 25, 2018: [Entry of Default]
  • April 25, 2018: [Default Judgment]
  • April 25, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 24, 2018: [Service by Publication]
  • April 12, 2018: [Judgment - Consent]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 09, 2018: [Summons Issued]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Status Report]
  • March 20, 2018: [Disclaimer]
  • March 20, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • March 20, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • March 07, 2018: [Supplement]
  • March 05, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Notice of Removal]
  • March 05, 2018: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • March 05, 2018: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • March 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Service]
  • March 02, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • March 02, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • March 01, 2018: [Service]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • February 28, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.