U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00100
  • Case Name: Cortes v. Atencio et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Protective Order]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 17, 2019: [Corrective Entry]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Joinder]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Order]
  • September 05, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
July, 2018
  • July 10, 2018: [Order]
  • July 03, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 11, 2018: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • May 11, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • April 16, 2018: [Supplement]
  • April 13, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • April 11, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 11, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 11, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2018
  • March 13, 2018: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order]
  • March 12, 2018: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • March 01, 2018: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • February 28, 2018: [Complaint]
  • February 28, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • February 28, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 28, 2018: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.