U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00103
  • Case Name: Hazen v. Citibank, N.A.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • August 01, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • June 01, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • June 01, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Compel]
  • April 05, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2018
  • March 02, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • March 02, 2018: [Receipt]
  • March 02, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.