U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00109
  • Case Name: Weismann v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 26, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • November 09, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order]
  • October 11, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Order]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Relief]
May, 2018
  • May 08, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • May 08, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Order]
  • April 25, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 24, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 24, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 18, 2018: [Order]
  • April 18, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • April 18, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • April 16, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • April 03, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • March 07, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 06, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • March 06, 2018: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 06, 2018: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • March 05, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.