U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00108
  • Case Name: Jackson v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 23, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 23, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 23, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
October, 2018
  • October 04, 2018: [Response (generic)]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 24, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 17, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Administrative Record]
  • June 29, 2018: [Answer to Petition for Review]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • May 21, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 18, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 07, 2018: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • March 07, 2018: [Docket Annotation - Division Change]
  • March 07, 2018: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • March 05, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 05, 2018: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 05, 2018: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.