U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00106
  • Case Name: Humburg v. The Hartford
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 04, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Order]
July, 2018
  • July 03, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Order]
  • June 22, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 18, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • June 18, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • May 02, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 19, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • April 11, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 11, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 11, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 11, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2018
  • March 06, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • March 06, 2018: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.