U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00110
  • Case Name: Zurita v. US Ecology Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Order]
  • February 18, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Notice of Substitution]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 02, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 20, 2018: [Order]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 31, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 22, 2018: [Order]
  • May 22, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 17, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • May 14, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 04, 2018: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 04, 2018: [Response to Motion]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • April 20, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 20, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • April 19, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 13, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • April 13, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 13, 2018: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 13, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 06, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • April 04, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Order]
  • March 27, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 26, 2018: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • March 07, 2018: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • March 07, 2018: [Receipt]
  • March 07, 2018: [Supplement]
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.