U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00401
  • Case Name: Rafter H Construction, LLC et al v. Big-D Construction Corp et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order]
  • December 20, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 18, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 14, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 09, 2018: [Reconsideration]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 08, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 08, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 08, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Order]
  • April 24, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 24, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 24, 2018: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • April 17, 2018: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 06, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.