U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00112
  • Case Name: Willis v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • July 23, 2018: [Settlement Conference]
  • July 13, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order]
  • July 03, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 11, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • June 11, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • May 08, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • May 08, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 08, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2018
  • March 13, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • March 08, 2018: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • March 08, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • March 07, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.