U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:08-cv-00229
  • Case Name: Huntsman Advanced Materials LLC v. OneBeacon America Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 05, 2020: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 05, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Order]
  • January 24, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • January 22, 2020: [Joinder]
  • January 15, 2020: [Supplement]
  • January 15, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 14, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 06, 2019: [Answer to Intervenor Complaint]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 13, 2019: [Intervenor Complaint]
  • August 02, 2019: [Order]
  • August 02, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • June 06, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Supplement]
  • May 24, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 03, 2019: [Order]
  • May 02, 2019: [Stipulation]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 22, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 01, 2019: [Intervene]
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 07, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 13, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order]
  • July 03, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Transcript]
  • June 28, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 28, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • June 08, 2018: [Declaration]
  • June 08, 2018: [Response to Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 10, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • April 17, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • April 06, 2018: [Declaration]
  • April 06, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • April 02, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 02, 2018: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.