U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00111
  • Case Name: Grunig et al v. Johnson, Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • December 16, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 16, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 10, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 08, 2019: [Response to Motion]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • September 30, 2019: [File Excess Pages]
  • September 30, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 25, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 19, 2019: [Strike]
  • September 17, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • September 04, 2019: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order]
  • September 04, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 03, 2019: [Stipulation]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 20, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 12, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Order]
  • June 11, 2019: [Stipulation]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Order]
  • April 03, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 01, 2019: [Stipulation]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • November 28, 2018: [Stipulation]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • August 07, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • July 31, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • June 25, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • June 22, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • June 20, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • June 19, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 19, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 05, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 05, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Affidavit of Service]
  • March 08, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • March 08, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • March 07, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.