U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00114
  • Case Name: Reyes v. Corizon Health Services, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend]
  • November 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: [Extension of Time to Amend]
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend]
  • August 02, 2018: [Extension of Time to Amend]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Order]
  • July 02, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • July 02, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • June 15, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • March 09, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • March 09, 2018: [Complaint]
  • March 09, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • March 09, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.