U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00115
  • Case Name: Reyes v. Thueson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • November 21, 2019: [Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • September 04, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
May, 2019
  • May 06, 2019: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Consents (All are in)]
  • March 25, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • March 07, 2019: [Reconsideration]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 04, 2019: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • February 04, 2019: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 01, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • February 01, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 01, 2019: [Dismiss]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • January 09, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 02, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 02, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 04, 2018: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order]
  • December 03, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 27, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 27, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 02, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order]
  • July 02, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • June 15, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • March 09, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • March 09, 2018: [Complaint]
  • March 09, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • March 09, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.