U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00116
  • Case Name: Reyes v. Frasier et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 20, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend]
  • August 02, 2018: [Extension of Time to Amend]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Order]
  • July 02, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • March 09, 2018: [Complaint]
  • March 09, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • March 09, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 09, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.