U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00117
  • Case Name: Chidichimo et al v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 20, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 16, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 16, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 16, 2018: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
October, 2018
  • October 04, 2018: [Settlement Conference]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • August 21, 2018: [Stipulation]
July, 2018
  • July 03, 2018: [Order]
  • July 03, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 19, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • June 19, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 19, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 07, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • June 07, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 21, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • May 21, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • May 16, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • May 16, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • May 15, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 14, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2018
  • March 13, 2018: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • March 12, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.