U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00120
  • Case Name: Ventive, LLC v. Caring People, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 19, 2020: [Dismiss]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Report of Mediation]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Joint Mediation Statement]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 30, 2018: [Order Referring Case to Arbitration]
  • October 30, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 26, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • October 24, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 23, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order]
  • October 12, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 12, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • October 10, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • September 26, 2018: [Order]
  • September 26, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 26, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 10, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • August 20, 2018: [Leave to File Document]
  • August 10, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 20, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 06, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • July 06, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 27, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 15, 2018: [Status Report]
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • May 16, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • May 04, 2018: [Order Staying Case]
  • May 04, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 01, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 01, 2018: [Consent Filed]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Status Report]
  • April 24, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • April 16, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 16, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 11, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 04, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • March 30, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • March 28, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • March 20, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • March 16, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 15, 2018: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • March 15, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • March 15, 2018: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 15, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • March 15, 2018: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • March 13, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.