U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cv-00121
  • Case Name: State of Idaho Department of Health & Welfare v. Khurana et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2018: [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • April 04, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 04, 2018: [Judgment]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [Supplement]
  • March 14, 2018: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • March 13, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
  • March 13, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.