U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cv-00124
  • Case Name: Jackson's Buy, Sell, Trade, Inc. et al v. Giddings et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 30, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 30, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 04, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 04, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 13, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 10, 2019: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 10, 2019: [Notice of Case Number Change]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 29, 2019: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 29, 2019: [Corrective Entry]
  • April 22, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • April 09, 2019: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 08, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 08, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Order]
  • December 14, 2018: [Stipulation]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 22, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • May 22, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • May 15, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • May 11, 2018: [Consent Filed]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 29, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • March 20, 2018: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • March 19, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 15, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 15, 2018: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 15, 2018: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • March 15, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • March 14, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.