U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00123
  • Case Name: McCoy v. Finn et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2018
  • August 01, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 01, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Order]
  • July 18, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • July 18, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 18, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • June 19, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • June 13, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Supplement]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • March 14, 2018: [Complaint]
  • March 14, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • March 14, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • March 14, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.