U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00122
  • Case Name: Rush v. Ada County Prosecutors Office et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Order]
  • September 20, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 20, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • April 20, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • March 14, 2018: [Complaint]
  • March 14, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • March 14, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 14, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.