U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00524
  • Case Name: Merchant v. Corizon, L.L.C. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 06, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 26, 2019: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • December 26, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 19, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 10, 2019: [Transcript]
  • December 06, 2019: [Attorney Fees]
  • December 06, 2019: [Bill of Costs]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 22, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 22, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 05, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 04, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 22, 2019: [Statement]
  • October 21, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 21, 2019: [Declaration]
  • October 21, 2019: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 17, 2019: [Errata]
  • October 04, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [In Limine]
  • September 30, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 26, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • September 12, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Order]
  • August 21, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 15, 2019: [Stipulation]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Stipulation]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 15, 2019: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • April 15, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 12, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 01, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: [Order]
  • March 07, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 28, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • February 08, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 07, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Order]
  • December 12, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 04, 2018: [Stipulation]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 21, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 20, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 10, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 10, 2018: [Letter]
  • August 06, 2018: [Response to Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 16, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 16, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 11, 2018: [Stipulation]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • June 04, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • May 24, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • May 21, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 21, 2018: [Order]
  • May 15, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • May 11, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • May 10, 2018: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • April 11, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • April 10, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 10, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 10, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • April 10, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • April 10, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 20, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 15, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • March 15, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.