U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00125
  • Case Name: White v. Pocatello Hospital, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 04, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 19, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Order]
  • May 20, 2019: [Stipulation]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order]
  • February 26, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 16, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • February 13, 2019: [Protective Order]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 08, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 08, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • July 12, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 28, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 28, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • June 26, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • June 21, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • June 13, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 05, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • June 05, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • June 04, 2018: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • June 01, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • May 31, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 31, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 16, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Status Report]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.