U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00128
  • Case Name: Lopez v. Life Insurance Company of North America and Employee Benefit Policy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 20, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 19, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • December 03, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Response to Motion]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • October 29, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • October 29, 2018: [Supplement]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 28, 2018: [Order]
  • September 28, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 24, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 20, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 20, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 08, 2018: [Statement]
  • June 01, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Disclosure Statement]
  • May 23, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • May 16, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • May 15, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 15, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 08, 2018: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 26, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 26, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 30, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 26, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • March 23, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • March 23, 2018: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 23, 2018: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • March 22, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 20, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.