U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00134
  • Case Name: Gomez v. Atencio et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 06, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Letter]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Letter]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 17, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 17, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 25, 2019: [Order]
  • April 25, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • December 06, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 06, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 06, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2018
  • October 02, 2018: [Order]
  • October 02, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Order]
  • August 13, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • August 13, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • March 22, 2018: [Complaint]
  • March 22, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • March 22, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 22, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.