U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00136
  • Case Name: Smout et al v. Benewah County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Order]
  • April 10, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 10, 2020: [Withdrawal of a document]
  • April 09, 2020: [Order]
  • April 09, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 06, 2020: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • April 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 06, 2020: [Order on Motion in Limine]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 08, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 06, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • January 03, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2020: [Stipulation]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [In Limine]
  • December 16, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Expert Witness Disclosure]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Order]
  • September 18, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 17, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 17, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • September 16, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • September 03, 2019: [Statement]
  • September 03, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [File Excess Pages]
  • August 12, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 10, 2019: [Notice of Case Number Change]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Stipulation]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Order]
  • January 11, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • January 08, 2019: [Stipulation]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 10, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • July 10, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 11, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • June 08, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • May 30, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 25, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 25, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 18, 2018: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • May 18, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 15, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order]
  • May 14, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 09, 2018: [Complaint]
  • May 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Waive]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Waive]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.