U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00137
  • Case Name: Kyani, Inc. v. Stevens et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • May 04, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 02, 2018: [Response to Motion]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 25, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 18, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 04, 2018: [Errata]
  • April 04, 2018: [Remand to State Court]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • March 27, 2018: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • March 27, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • March 26, 2018: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • March 26, 2018: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 26, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • March 23, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.