U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00139
  • Case Name: Withrow v. L & W Supply Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 11, 2018: [Dismiss]
May, 2018
  • May 07, 2018: [Order]
  • May 07, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 07, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 07, 2018: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 04, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 01, 2018: [Order]
  • May 01, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order]
  • April 20, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 20, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • April 13, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • April 13, 2018: [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 13, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • April 13, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 12, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 12, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order]
  • April 12, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 11, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • April 09, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 09, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 09, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 05, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order]
  • April 02, 2018: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 29, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • March 29, 2018: [Order]
  • March 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 29, 2018: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 29, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • March 29, 2018: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • March 28, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 27, 2018: [Expedite]
  • March 27, 2018: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 27, 2018: [Third Party Complaint]
  • March 27, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 27, 2018: [Counterclaim]
  • March 27, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.