U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00140
  • Case Name: BBQ 4 LIFE, LLC et al v. DICKEY'S BARBECUE RESTAURANTS, INC.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 14, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Order]
  • August 29, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 20, 2019: [Stipulation]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order]
  • May 02, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 29, 2019: [Transcript]
  • April 24, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 24, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 16, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 15, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Corrective Entry]
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 27, 2019: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 27, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 26, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 26, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • March 21, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 21, 2019: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • March 12, 2019: [Partial Summary Judgment]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 11, 2019: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • February 11, 2019: [Discovery Plan]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • January 22, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 17, 2019: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • January 17, 2019: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 10, 2019: [Litigation Order]
  • January 10, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 04, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • January 02, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 02, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • November 05, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 18, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 10, 2018: [Notice of Letter of Dismissal]
July, 2018
  • July 03, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • March 30, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • March 28, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 28, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.